Young, Todd Kevin (CPSO#: 80782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Street Medical Clinic
165 Main St
Springdale, NL
Springdale NL  A0J 1T0
Phone: 8775784861
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. K. Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 7 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD KEVIN YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: January 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

Dr. Young was found guilty of conduct deserving of sanction by the Adjudication Tribunal of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Newfoundland and Labrador in relation to sexual boundary issues. The finding was made on January 11, 2016. Dr. Young’s licence to practice medicine in Newfoundland and Labrador was suspended for a period of 19 months, which ended November 30, 2015. Dr. Young is required to (a) participate in regular counseling services, (b) attend at the College for interviews, (c) participate in continuing medical education in the areas of ethics and professionalism, and (d) attend and treat female patients only in the presence of a female chaperone throughout all examinations of a sensitive nature for 12 months. The CPSO was notified of this finding by a report dated February 8, 2016.