Young, William Adam (CPSO#: 12337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 1950 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1947
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Feb 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003