Youngson, Bruce James (CPSO#: 53959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology Rm 11E 227
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5573
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE JAMES YOUNGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNGSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985