Younis, Moftah Mohammed (CPSO#: 87664)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Garyounis University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2007 to 09 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 10 Oct 2007 to 09 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 10 Oct 2008 to 09 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 10 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 2010