Yousaf, Huma (CPSO#: 88118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Torbram Medical Centre and
Walk In Clinic
Suite 105
10 Father Tobin Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0W9
Phone: (905) 789-1750
Fax: (905) 789-1787
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huma Yousaf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yousaf ( CPSO# 88118 )

Business Address:
Tobram Medical Centre and Walk In Clinic
Suite 105
10 Father Tobin Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0W9
Phone Number: (905) 789-1750

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUMA YOUSAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010