Yousef, George Makram (CPSO#: 82266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 77605
Fax: (416) 864-5648
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE MAKRAM YOUSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2006