Yousef, Jakline Maher Yacoub (CPSO#: 87935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
M3M0B2
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z4
Phone: (416) 2421000 Ext. 43099
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAKLINE MAHER YACOUB YOUSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSEF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009