Yousif, Thair Habib (CPSO#: 80095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yousif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Yousif ( CPSO# 80095 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 09 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THAIR HABIB YOUSIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2004