Youssef, Hesham Nabil Youssef Ahmed (CPSO#: 87961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  21 Sep 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Hesham Nabil Youssef Ahmed Youssef may practise anaesthesiology with
                  London  Health  Sciences  Centre  - Victoria Hospital in London, Ontario,
                  while under supervision coordinated  by  a  supervisor  acceptable to the
                  College.

            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires three  years  from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Youssef's knowledge, skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Youssef's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 22, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before September 21, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.