Youssef, Youssef Mikhail Rezk (CPSO#: 61257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, German

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4595
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. M. Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Youssef ( CPSO# 61257 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUSSEF MIKHAIL REZK YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991