Yousuf, Junaid Abdul Hameed (CPSO#: 87612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Program
Windsor Regional Hospital
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Junaid Yousuf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yousuf ( CPSO# 87612 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUNAID ABDUL HAMEED YOUSUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSUF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011