Yu, Adelicia Chee Wing (CPSO#: 94419)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011