Yu, Catherine Hil-Yen (CPSO#: 78007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
61 Queen Street East
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7424
Fax: (416) 867-3654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yu ( CPSO# 78007 )

Business Address:
7th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7424


Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Cho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cho ( CPSO# 79346 )
Dr. C. Yu ( CPSO# 78007 )

Business Address:
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Southlake Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE HIL-YEN YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006