Yu, Chanpei Jack (CPSO#: 72455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions:  Former patients of Dr. Yu should contact the clinic where they saw him to request a copy of their medical record; as each clinic he worked at maintained ownership of the record.
Date Received: 24 Dec 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANPEI JACK YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2000