Yu, Eric Ho Cheung (CPSO#: 62333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 470
New East Wing Fifth Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5815
Fax: (416) 603-5398
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EHC Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yu ( CPSO# 62333 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 5 - 470
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5815

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Business Address:
Medi-Scan Diagnostic Services
Suite 8
2575 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 690-9437

Business Address:
Healthy Heart Diagnostics
156 Romina Drive
Vaughan ON  L4K 4Z7
Phone Number: (905) 761-2841

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC HO CHEUNG YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1991