Yu, Jingjie (CPSO#: 100924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cloud Care Clinics
55 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone: (416) 361-6000
Fax: (416) 361-6044
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jingjie Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yang ( CPSO# 100748)
Dr. J. Yu ( CPSO# 100924)

Business Address:
Cloud Care Clinics
55 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 361-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JINGJIE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015