Yu, John Chien-Chiang (CPSO#: 71242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Radiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John C. Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yu ( CPSO# 71242 )
Dr. R. Cao ( CPSO# 91175 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Room 1C153
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHIEN-CHIANG YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002