Yu, Joseph Wing Cheong (CPSO#: 25767)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. J. Yu Unit 205 1550 South Gateway Road Mississauga, Ontario L4W 5G6
Instructions: Please include your full name, contact number, and if possible a fax number of where the medical records are to be sent
Date Received: 09 Apr 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Yu voluntarily resigned from the College.