Yu, Maggie Yongci (CPSO#: 105968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:All Saints University (Dominica), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
M C L 8-401
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 340-3455
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGGIE YONGCI YU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YU is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. YU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. YU shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018