Yu, Maria Chi Yun (CPSO#: 67861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
88 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2H6
Phone: (905) 683-0690
Fax: (905) 683-1431
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA CHI YUN YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1996