Yu, Norman Bau-Min (CPSO#: 67879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northwood Medical Centre
35 Springbank Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 7P6
Phone: (519) 537-6147
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norman Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yu ( CPSO# 67879 )

Business Address:
Northwood Medical Centre
35 Springbank Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 7P6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN BAU-MIN YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1996