Yu, Shui Eugene (CPSO#: 70191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-959
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4989
Fax: (416) 946-6564
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Grace Y. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Liu ( CPSO# 69216 )
Dr. S. Yu ( CPSO# 70191 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite B627
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5063

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUI EUGENE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001