Yu, Yau Woon Edward (CPSO#: 66597)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2006