Yu-Siao, Barbara Ann (CPSO#: 85801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
69 Facer Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 5J3
Phone: (905) 935-2828
Fax: (905) 935-5478
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-3784647 Ext. 46573
Fax: 9057044406
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Yu-Siao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Yu-Siao ( CPSO# 85801 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
69 Facer Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 5J3
Phone Number: (905) 935-2828

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANN YU-SIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU-SIAO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2009