Yuan, Jane (CPSO#: 83011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 515
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-2300
Fax: (416) 431-2303
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Yuan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yuan ( CPSO# 83011 )

Business Address:
Unit 515
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-2300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE YUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009