Yuan, Lilian (CPSO#: 33667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17250 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6Z1
Phone: (905) 830-4444 Ext. 72007
Fax: (905) 895-3166
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIAN YUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987