Yuan, Su (CPSO#: 104680)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Aug 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2017 to 29 Jan 2017
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2017