Yuen, Doris Elizabeth (CPSO#: 60062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital
Room D4 202
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 64361
Fax: (519) 646-6123
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Doris E. Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yuen ( CPSO# 60062 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital
Room D4 202
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIS ELIZABETH YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1989