Yuen, Keng Hong Peter (CPSO#: 71660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 122
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 293-8800
Fax: (416) 293-8803
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.H. Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yuen ( CPSO# 71660 )

Business Address:
Suite 122
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 293-8800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENG HONG PETER YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1999