Yufe, Robert Solomon (CPSO#: 26706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 408
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 746-1171
Fax: (416) 746-1172
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yufe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yufe ( CPSO# 26706 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 746-1171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 02 Dec 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SOLOMON YUFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUFE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1977