Yumen, Omar (CPSO#: 51989)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1999