Yung, Christoph Ying-Wai (CPSO#: 24309)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2006