Yunker, Peter Joseph (CPSO#: 30261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter J. Yunker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yunker ( CPSO# 30261 )

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2720

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand
Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH YUNKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUNKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1978