Yuoness, Salem A H (CPSO#: 84134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brandon Regional Health Centre
Department of Nuclear Medicine
150 Mc Tavish Ave. East - G149
Brandon MB  R7A 2B3
Phone: (204) 578-4326
Fax: (204) 578-4882

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEM A H YUONESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUONESS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Apr 2006 to 26 May 2006
PEAP - Resident - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2013