Yvorchuk, Kenneth Joseph (CPSO#: 64372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301-740 Hillside Avenue
Victoria BC  V8T 1Z4
Phone: (250) 595-1551
Fax: (250) 595-6793

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH JOSEPH YVORCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YVORCHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991