Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zabieliauskas, Raymond John (CPSO#: 52115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Lithuanian

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3315 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1E7
Phone: 416 231 7246
Fax: 416 231 9900
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND JOHN ZABIELIAUSKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZABIELIAUSKAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1983