Zacharias, Samuel Ramesh Kumar (CPSO#: 33152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor 4V Section
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 74328
Fax: (905) 577-8022
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 7M4
Canada
Phone: (950) 569-8617
Fax: 905-567-8617
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Oct 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Oct 2009 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 14, 2009, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Samuel Ramesh Kumar
            Zacharias, in accordance with the undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Zacharias to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Samuel Ramesh Kumar Zacharias has voluntarily agreed not to engage in
                  the practice of intravenous Lidocaine infusion therapy.