Zachos, Marianthi (CPSO#: 69244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75637
Fax: (905) 521-2655
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 9058452571 Ext. 6263
Fax: 905-815-5074
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Engmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zachos ( CPSO# 69244 )
Dr. E. Engmann ( CPSO# 69279 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4601

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
Department of Radiology
30 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L6T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANTHI ZACHOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZACHOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999