Zackon, David Hyman (CPSO#: 33568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone: (613) 596-0300
Fax: (613) 596-0848
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Eye Institute, Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8032
Fax: (613) 737-8220
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Zackon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zackon ( CPSO# 33568 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8032

Business Address:
205 - 2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 596-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HYMAN ZACKON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZACKON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1982