Zacks, Steven Lawrence (CPSO#: 63927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of Gastroenterol and Hepatology
8009 Burnett Womack Building
CB 7584
UNC at Chapel Hill
Chapel Hill NC  27599-7584
United States
Phone: (919) 966-2516
Fax: (919) 966-1700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN LAWRENCE ZACKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZACKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992