Zadeh, Teanoosh (CPSO#: 67372)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: Hosseinzadeh, Teanoosh (used until: 21 Apr 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:Laval University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Oct 2016