Zadik, Robert Amnon (CPSO#: 72496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert A. Zadik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zadik ( CPSO# 72496 )

Business Address:
FACE Cosmetic Surgery
251 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M5R 1J9

Business Address:
Dental Anaesthesia & Associates
200 - 1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4
Phone Number: (416) 968-7900

Business Address:
Cosmetic Rejuvenation Clinic
214 - 10 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2G4

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Brampton Cosmetic Surgery and Medical Spa
Suite 400
145 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 451-5855

Business Address:
Crescent Oral Surgery
Suite 400
9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Phone Number: (905) 889-8806

Business Address:
Crescent Oral Surgery
Suite 500
1940 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Phone Number: (416) 752-5222

Business Address:
Crescent Oral Surgery
Suite 200
236 Wellington Street East
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 713-9990

Business Address:
Herzig Eye Institue
Sutie 210
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 929-2020

Business Address:
Forest Hill Institute of Aesthetic Plastic Surgery
1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 785-7864

Business Address:
Suite 201
1490 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 461-0424

Business Address:
Suite 203
4040 Finch avenue
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 754-2022

Business Address:
Dr. Nolan Kane Facial and Cosmetic Surgery
7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 763-1107

Business Address:
300 York Mills Road
North York ON  M2L 2Y5
Phone Number: (416) 391-4452

Business Address:
Suite 602
1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4
Phone Number: (416) 928-3444

Business Address:
Toronto Facial Cosmetic Surgery Clinic
Suite 31
70 Yorkville
Toronto ON  M3R 1B9
Phone Number: (647) 343-0207

Business Address:
Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
Pro-Med Endoscopy
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
York Diagnostic Centre
Unit 4
3585 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
Digestive Health Clinic
330 York Regional Road 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8

Business Address:
Allevio Pain Management
Suite 101
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 840-5990

Business Address:
Can-Am HIFU
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 924-9760

Business Address:
Sunrise Kids Dental
1089 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M4E 3S2
Phone Number: (647) 350-7562

Business Address:
Verso Surgery Centre
1148 Winston Churchill
Oakville ON  L6J 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 849-7560

Business Address:
Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
The Plastice Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5

Business Address:
Peachtree Kids Dental
Suite 1
525 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3R 7K8
Phone Number: (519) 304-5430

Business Address:
Downsview Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 201
1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT AMNON ZADIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZADIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003