Zadiyko, Jerry (CPSO#: 18804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1963

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1436 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M9P 3A9
Phone: (416) 236-3888
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]





            As from September 22, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jerry Zadiyko, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Zadiyko to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: 

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                           DR. JERRY ZADIYKO
                                            ("Dr. Zadiyko")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, certificate of registration number 18804, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (2)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (3)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
                              three months, which shall be selected by the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) independent of my participation, on the basis
                              of  the areas of concern identified in the medical assessors'
                              reports, one dated September 20, 2013 and the other received
                              by the College on May 27, 2014 (the "Assessors' Reports"),
                              and any concerns that arise during the period of Clinical
                              Supervision;
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me once every three (3) months;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Engage in any other activities, such as reviewing other
                              documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues,
                              that the Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the Assessors' Reports, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under this term of the
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out under sections (3)(e) and/or (f)
                        above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (3)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (4)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (3) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under this term of the Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
            (5)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (11)  I, Dr. Zadiyko, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Zadiyko was the subject of a College re-assessment regarding
                        his standard of practice.  As a result of the reassessment:
                  
                              Dr. Zadiyko will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months;
                              and
                  
                              Dr. Zadiyko's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within twelve (12) months of the end
                              of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Zadiyko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my clinical supervision and practice
                  reassessment set out in sections (3) and (4) above and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Zadiyko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Zadiyko, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the clinical supervision and practice reassessment set
                  out in sections (3) and (4)  above, and to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set
                        out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at section (4) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 22, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jerry Zadiyko to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 22, 2015:

Dr. Zadiyko was the subject of a College re-assessment regarding his standard of practice. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Zadiyko will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months; and

Dr. Zadiyko’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within twelve (12) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.