Zadorozny, Oleg Gilbert (CPSO#: 51985)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Clinique Medical Gamelin 3C-520 Hopital Gatineau, QC J8V 2P5
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017