Zadra, Remo (CPSO#: 59554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 853-2888
Fax: (905) 853-6607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Remo Zadra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2007

Dr. R. Zadra ( CPSO# 59554 )

Business Address:
Unit 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 853-2888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. REMO ZADRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZADRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1989