Zafar, Moiz Mohammed (CPSO#: 72495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 954-1500
Fax: (905) 954-0744
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Moiz M. Zafar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zafar ( CPSO# 72495 )

Business Address:
Suite 212
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 954-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOIZ MOHAMMED ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004