Zafar, Rubeena (CPSO#: 93392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgina Family Medical Centre
Suite 201
417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone: (905) 989-7800
Fax: 905-535-7800
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chartwell Aurora Long Term Care Res
32 Mill Street
Aurora ON  L4G 2R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 727-193
Fax: 905) 727-6299
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Centrum Medical Center
384 Yonge Street,Unit #5
Barrie ON  L4N 4C8
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-0966
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

River Glen Haven Long Nursing Home
160 High Street ON
Sutton West ON  L0E 1R0
Canada
Phone: (905) 722-8148
Fax: (905) 722-7992
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Centrum Services Medical Clinic
200 Davis Drive
Unit #4
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-853-8525
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubeena Zafar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zafar ( CPSO# 93392 )

Business Address:
160 High Street
Sutton ON  L0E 1R0
Phone Number: (905) 722-8148

Business Address:
Georgina Family Medical Centre
201 - 417 The Queensway
Keswick ON  L4C 3B2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBEENA ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2011 to 27 Aug 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2011 to 30 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2012 to 30 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013