Zagzoog, Amin Hussein A (CPSO#: 94901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 31 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H-1285
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7270
Fax: (613) 696-7124
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIN HUSSEIN A ZAGZOOG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ZAGZOOG is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ZAGZOOG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZAGZOOG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ZAGZOOG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ZAGZOOG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ZAGZOOG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 May 2011
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018