Zahariadis, George (CPSO#: 71359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Forest Rd
Room 271B, Dr.. L.A. Miller Center
Office of the Director and Chief
Public Health and Microbiology
St. John's NL  A1A 3Z9
Phone: 709 777 7233
Fax: 709 777 7070
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Zahariadis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE ZAHARIADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHARIADIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012