Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zaharie, Colette Denise (CPSO#: 64432)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak, Spanish

Education:Autonomus University of Chihuahua, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Vazska 17 Piestany Slovakia 92101
Date Received: 15 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 29 May 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Sep 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2014